NH HB1285 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/03/2016; Chapter 38; Eff. 7/2/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/03/2016; Chapter 38; Eff. 7/2/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the donation of food that has passed its expiration date.
Title
Relative to the donation of food that has passed its expiration date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 05/03/2016; Chapter 38; Eff. 7/2/2016 |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 51 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/21/2016); Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/07/2016; Senate Journal 12 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/07/2016; Senate Calendar 13 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0091h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 35 |
2016-03-09 | House | Amendment #2016-0091h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 35 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0091h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 21 |
2016-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2016 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building205 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 8 |