NH HB1284 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to highway agents.
Title
Relative to highway agents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 53 |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 34 |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2016 01:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2016-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building301 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 4 P. 8 |