NH HB1283 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 11-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to prohibiting the online disclosure of personally identifiable information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to prohibiting the online disclosure of personally identifiable information.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseInterim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 11-0)
2020-08-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 09/15/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/94238069790 - Executive Session to Follow
2020-03-11HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 148
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 42
2020-02-19House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/25/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2020-01-30HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2020-01-21House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/05/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2020-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2020 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback