NH HB1281 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Executive Session: 06/02/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Executive Session: 06/02/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to firearms confiscated from a person who is subject to a protective order.
Title
Relative to access to firearms confiscated from a person who is subject to a protective order.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Roy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Executive Session: 06/02/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-05-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/02/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-03-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-19 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 01/26/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2022 03:15 pm State House Reps Hall |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |