NH HB1281 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 28; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 28; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an executive order registry.
Title
Establishing an executive order registry.
Sponsors
Rep. James McConnell [R] | Rep. Mindi Messmer [D] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] | Rep. John O'Day [R] |
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Keith Ammon [R] | Rep. Glen Aldrich [R] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] |
Rep. Lucy Weber [D] | Rep. Amelia Keane [D] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 28; Eff. 7/14/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Rules and Enrolled Bills; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0193h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 8 |
2018-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2018-0193h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 8 |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0193h for 02/22/2018 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 8 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 01/23/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 5 |