NH HB1280 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/16/2020; Chapter 13; I. Sec. 5 Eff: 07/01/2020 II. Sec. 12 and 14 Eff: 01/01/2021 at 12:04am III. Sec 8/9-11 Eff: 01/01/2021 IV. Sec. 1-4/6 and 13 Eff: 09/14/2020 V. Rem. Eff: 07/16/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to copayments for insulin, establishing a wholesale prescription drug importation program, establishing a New Hampshire prescription drug affordability board, establishing the prescription drug competitive marketplace, relative to the pricing of generic prescription drugs, relative to prior authorization for prescription drug coverage, and requiring insurance coverage for epinephrine auto-injectors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to copayments for insulin, establishing a wholesale prescription drug importation program, establishing a New Hampshire prescription drug affordability board, establishing the prescription drug competitive marketplace, relative to the pricing of generic prescription drugs, relative to prior authorization for prescription drug coverage, and requiring insurance coverage for epinephrine auto-injectors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 345 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 223 N: 121 NV: 15 Abs: 37) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-17HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/16/2020; Chapter 13; I. Sec. 5 Eff: 07/01/2020 II. Sec. 12 and 14 Eff: 01/01/2021 at 12:04am III. Sec 8/9-11 Eff: 01/01/2021 IV. Sec. 1-4/6 and 13 Eff: 09/14/2020 V. Rem. Eff: 07/16/2020
2020-07-14SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-07-14HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 73
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1631: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 73
2020-07-10SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1631e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 224-104 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 16
2020-06-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1470s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1470s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1470s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23
2020-06-02SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 21B
2020-06-02Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 21B
2020-06-02Senate5. Webinar ID: 973 4929 8372 Senate Calendar 21B
2020-06-02Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13017158592,,97349298372# or 13126266799,,97349298372# Senate Calendar 21B
2020-06-02Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 21B
2020-06-02Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 21B
2020-06-02Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_jolWTc_BQC6QKTVDcC5zSw Senate Calendar 21B
2020-06-02SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 21B
2020-06-02SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 21B
2020-06-02SenateRemote Hearing: 06/05/2020, 09:05 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1298s; Senate Calendar 21B
2020-06-02SenateRemote Hearing: 06/05/2020, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 21B
2020-06-01SenateIntroduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0105h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 223-121 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 104
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0105h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 104
2020-03-04HouseMinority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
2020-03-04HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0105h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 36
2020-02-20House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-02-20House==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/24/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-02-12HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-23House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-15HousePublic Hearing: 01/21/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2032&sy=2020&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1280
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&id=1143&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1143
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1143
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=87&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1280&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1280&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2032
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=70&sy=2020&lb=S&eb=HB1280&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1280&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2032
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=182&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1280&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1280&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2032

Bill Comments

feedback