NH HB1277 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study alternatives for funding the operation, maintenance, and repair of state owned dams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study alternatives for funding the operation, maintenance, and repair of state owned dams.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-07HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 22
2024-02-28HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/21/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 14
2024-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2024-02-07HousePublic Hearing: 02/14/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2023-12-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback