NH HB1277 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 190; 08/16/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 190; 08/16/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the reporting of cybersecurity incidents.
Title
Relative to the reporting of cybersecurity incidents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 190; 08/16/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Dolan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1421s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1421s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1421s, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 1:30 p.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |