NH HB1277 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring notice to owners of dogs that have failed to license their dog or renew their dog license.
Title
Requiring notice to owners of dogs that have failed to license their dog or renew their dog license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 24 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-02-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 17-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 35 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 16 |