NH HB1272 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the powers of local boards of education.
Title
Relative to the powers of local boards of education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 23 |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 12 |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 5 |