NH HB127 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to placement and removal of political advertising.
Title
Relative to placement and removal of political advertising.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 6 |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 4 |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95709405955 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2021 09:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/93640014012 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initiallyconvened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 36 |