NH HB1266 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/17/2020; Chapter 14; I. Sec. 10-13 Eff: 01/01/2021 II. Rem. Eff: 07/17/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/17/2020; Chapter 14; I. Sec. 10-13 Eff: 01/01/2021 II. Rem. Eff: 07/17/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Making temporary modifications to the absentee voter registration, absentee ballot application, and absentee voting processes in response to the novel coronavirus (Covid-19) disease.
Title
Making temporary modifications to the absentee voter registration, absentee ballot application, and absentee voting processes in response to the novel coronavirus (Covid-19) disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 350 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/17/2020; Chapter 14; I. Sec. 10-13 Eff: 01/01/2021 II. Rem. Eff: 07/17/2020 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-07-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1616e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 70 |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1616e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-30 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Cote): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 221-101 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 30 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2020-1582s, and 2020-1608s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2020-1608s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1582s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1582s, 06/29/2020; Senate Calendar 25 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | 1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_PTTnQnIkQP-k8rHDlcyGiw Senate Calendar 24 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | 2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 24 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | The following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 24 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | 6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 24 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | 5. Webinar ID: 917 7748 7582 Senate Calendar 24 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | 4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,91777487582# or 19292056099,,91777487582# Senate Calendar 24 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | 3. To listen via telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799, or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 24 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Members of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 24 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Committee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 24 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/25/2020, 02:10 pm, on proposed amendment # 2020-1562s; Senate Calendar 24 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/25/2020, 02:05 pm; Senate Calendar 24 |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0791h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 63 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-0791h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 63 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0791h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 51 |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 (or after session) |
2020-02-12 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/04/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 (if not exec'd on the 3rd) |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 15 |