NH HB1265 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 173; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the release of criminal conviction records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the release of criminal conviction records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 173; Eff. 8/7/2018
2018-05-09HouseEnrolled 05/03/2018
2018-05-09SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17
2018-04-26HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1430s (Rep. Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 House Journal 14 P. 2
2018-04-19SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1430s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-19SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1430s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1430s, 04/19/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
2018-04-03SenateHearing: 04/10/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 16
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2018-02-22HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 5
2018-02-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/22/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 5
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 204
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2018 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback