NH HB1262 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Removed from Consent (Rep. McGuire) 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Removed from Consent (Rep. McGuire) 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 250th anniversary of the Pine Tree Riot.
Title
Commemorating the 250th anniversary of the Pine Tree Riot.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hopper [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - ITL (Y: 224 N: 124 NV: 17 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. McGuire) 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 224-124 02/17/2022 House Journal 4 |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 01/11/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |