NH HB1262 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - House Signed by the Governor 07/06/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0252

Summary

Relative to disabled parking signs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to disabled parking signs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-07 House Signed by the Governor 07/06/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0252
2010-06-02 House Enrolled
2010-06-02 Senate Enrolled
2010-06-02 House Conference Committee Report #2197 Adopted, Voice Vote
2010-06-02 Senate Conference Committee Report 2197; Adopted, Voice Vote
2010-05-27 Senate Conference Committee Report 2197; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed
2010-05-24 House Conference Committee Meeting: 5/25/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2010-05-19 Senate President Appoints: Senators Gilmour, Fuller Clark and Boutin
2010-05-19 Senate Sen. Letourneau Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote
2010-05-19 House Speaker Appoints: Reps M.O'Brien, R.Williams, L'Heureux & C.Williams; House Journal 42, PG.2155
2010-05-19 House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment & Requests Comm of Conf (Rep G.Richardson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.2155
2010-05-12 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution
2010-05-12 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1944s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg
2010-05-12 Senate Committee Amendment 1944s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2010-05-06 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1944s, 5/12/10; Senate Calendar 19
2010-04-15 Senate Hearing: April 29, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 11:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16
2010-03-24 Senate Introduced and Referred to Transportation & Interstate Cooperation; Senate Journal 11, Pg.261
2010-02-17 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0137h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.978
2010-02-17 House Amendment #0390h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.978
2010-02-10 House Special Ordered to Regular Place in Feb 17 Consent Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 16, PG.783
2010-02-10 House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Vaillancourt); House Journal 16, PG.748
2010-02-03 House Proposed Committee Amendment #0390h; House Calendar 13, PG.563
2010-02-03 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0137h for Feb 10 Consent Calendar (vote 16-0); House Calendar 13, PG.533
2010-01-26 House Executive Session: 2/2/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2010-01-19 House Continued Public Hearing: 1/26/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2010-01-12 House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 1/19/2010 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2009-12-21 House Public Hearing: 1/12/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 ==RECESSED==
2009-12-10 House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 6, PG.234

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback