NH HB1261 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Executive Session: 03/07/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the use of Native American mascots in public schools, colleges, and universities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the use of Native American mascots in public schools, colleges, and universities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-15 - House - ITL (Y: 170 N: 143 NV: 37 Abs: 40) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-23HouseExecutive Session: 03/07/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2022-03-21HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-143 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
2022-03-09HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2022-03-09HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar)
2022-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2021-11-19HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback