NH HB1260 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 295; Eff. 6/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the payout value of bingo games at private campgrounds and hotels, the hours of operation of Keno, and the sale of Lucky 7 tickets during bingo games.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the payout value of bingo games at private campgrounds and hotels, the hours of operation of Keno, and the sale of Lucky 7 tickets during bingo games.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 295; Eff. 6/25/2018
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1785s (Rep. Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-02SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1785s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1785s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateWithout Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment # 2018-1785s; 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateChair Ruled Sections of Amendment # 2018-1785s Non-Germane, 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1785s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-18SenateHearing: 04/25/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am, on proposed amendment # 2018-1546s; Senate Calendar 18
2018-03-15SenateHearing: 03/21/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 13
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 5
2018-02-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 16
2018-01-18HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 18
2018-01-18HouseExecutive Session: 01/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 202
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback