NH HB1256 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 25; Eff. 7/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 25; Eff. 7/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to decal fees for multi-use veterans decal plates.
Title
Relative to decal fees for multi-use veterans decal plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 25; Eff. 7/1/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 14 |
2018-01-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 16 |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 4 |