NH HB1253 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the choice of counselor to evaluate a child in family court proceedings.
Title
Relative to the choice of counselor to evaluate a child in family court proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Children and Family Law |