NH HB1246 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/17/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to reporting of health care associated infections, establishing a COVID-19 nursing home and long-term care fund, relative to an independent COVID-19 nursing home and long-term care review, needs assessment, and recommendations, authorizing pharmacists to administer a COVID-19 vaccine, and relative to the reimbursement of costs of training nursing assistants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to reporting of health care associated infections, establishing a COVID-19 nursing home and long-term care fund, relative to an independent COVID-19 nursing home and long-term care review, needs assessment, and recommendations, authorizing pharmacists to administer a COVID-19 vaccine, and relative to the reimbursement of costs of training nursing assistants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 351 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 07/17/2020
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10
2020-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-132 06/30/2020
2020-06-18SenateThe Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-18SenateSenator Giuda withdraws his request to divide the question; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-18SenateSenator Giuda moved to divide the question on the motion of Ought to Pass with Amendment: Sections 4-6, 8, and 12; Sections 1-3, 7, 9-12; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2020-1430s, and 2020-1539s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2020-1539s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1430s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1430s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23
2020-06-05SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate5. Webinar ID: 997 1560 0870 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 9292056099,,99715600870# or 13017158592,,99715600870# Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_DhzI7U5vQRi3zvou0MN6ow Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/10/2020, 08:05 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1369s; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/10/2020, 08:00 am; Senate Calendar 22
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7
2020-02-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0370h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 15
2020-02-19HouseAmendment # 2020-0370h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 15
2020-02-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0370h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 10
2020-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2516&sy=2020&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1246
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&id=1653&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1653
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1653
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=82&sy=2020&lb=S&eb=HB1246&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1246&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2516
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=194&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1246&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1246&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2516

Bill Comments

feedback