NH HB124 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 228-141 01/31/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing the law relative to the buffer zones to reproductive health care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the law relative to the buffer zones to reproductive health care facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - ITL (Y: 228 N: 141 NV: 6 Abs: 25) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 228-141 01/31/2019
2019-01-22HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-01-22HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/31/2019 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar)
2019-01-03HouseExecutive Session: 01/15/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building208
2019-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/09/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building208
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Judiciary

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback