NH HB124 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2470h (NT) (Vote 22-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing certain aircraft registration fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing certain aircraft registration fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-27HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2470h (NT) (Vote 22-1; Consent Calendar)
2017-10-12HouseExecutive Session: 10/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-10-12HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-10-04HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-09-19HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/27/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-08-15HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/19/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-03-16HouseRetained in Committee
2017-03-08HouseExecutive Session: 03/15/2017 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-03-01HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/07/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2017-02-17House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/28/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-02-14House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/23/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-02-14HouseReferred to Ways and Means 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 11
2017-02-09HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 11
2017-02-09HouseSpecial Order to beginning of regular calendar Without Objection House Journal 6 P. 11
2017-02-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/09/2017 (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 12
2017-01-05HouseExecutive Session: 01/25/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2017-01-05HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2016-12-21HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback