NH HB124 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - II. Remainder Effective 07/09/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - II. Remainder Effective 07/09/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the determination of gainful occupation for a group II member receiving an accidental disability retirement allowance from the retirement system, and relative to the director and assistant director of the division of homeland security and emergency management in the department of safety.
Title
Relative to the determination of gainful occupation for a group II member receiving an accidental disability retirement allowance from the retirement system, and relative to the director and assistant director of the division of homeland security and emergency management in the department of safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - C OF C #2070C (Y: 192 N: 156 NV: 32 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-10 | House | II. Remainder Effective 07/09/2013 |
2013-07-10 | House | I. Section 1 Effective 07/01/2013 |
2013-07-10 | House | Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Chapter 0196 |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2070c Adopted, Regular Calendar 192-156; House Journal 52, PG.1687-1689 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2070c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2013-2070c, Senate Amendment, Filed |
2013-06-14 | House | Conferee Change: Rep Shurtleff Replaces Rep Gagnon; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/14/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Carson, Soucy |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Weber, Gagnon, D.Sullivan, and Schuett [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1650 |
2013-06-12 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1618s and Requests C of C (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1650 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 6/6/13; Senate Calendar 23 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1618s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1618s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 1618s, New Title, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1618s, New Title, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | On 5/8/2013 at 9:00 a.m., a hearing on proposed non-germane amendment #2013-1356s to HB 124, Senate Calendar 19 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 4/3/13, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin |
2013-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Division Vote 181-97; House Journal 29, PG.998 |
2013-03-21 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Hansen): Motion Failed Division Vote 93-183; House Journal 29, PG.998 |
2013-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass (Rep Goley); House Journal 29, PG.998 |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation for Mar 20, Part II Regular Calendar; House Calendar 23 PG.591 |
2013-02-27 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/26/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/14/2013 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/29/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 ==RECESSED== |
2013-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 1/15/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.183 |