NH HB1235 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the prospective repeal of the rebuttable presumption of harm due to opioid drug abuse under the Child Protection Act.
Title
Repealing the prospective repeal of the rebuttable presumption of harm due to opioid drug abuse under the Child Protection Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 3 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 4 |