NH HB1234 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 192-145 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 192-145 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state and local government administration.
Title
Relative to state and local government administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - House - Veto Override (Y: 0 N: 10 NV: 344 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 351 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 351 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | House | Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 192-145 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote |
2020-07-29 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/28/2020 |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-07-16 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 74 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1621: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1621e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-30 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Wallner): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-129 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 36 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1487s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1487s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1487s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | The following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 5. Webinar ID: 969 7767 9197 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,96977679197# or +19292056099,,96977679197# Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_h44WQAbGQY2sJ8jzW9buaA Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Members of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Committee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/09/2020, 03:15 pm, on proposed amendment # 2020-1371s; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/09/2020, 03:10 pm; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0321h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 6 |
2020-03-05 | House | Amendment # 2020-0321h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 6 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0321h (NT) for 02/19/2020 (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 31 |
2020-01-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 01/29/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-01-22 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/28/2020 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-01-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Finance House Journal 1 P. 14 |