NH HB123 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Lay HB123 on Table (): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Lay HB123 on Table (): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to governing body members of the budget committee.
Title
Relative to governing body members of the budget committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - OTP (Y: 168 N: 176 NV: 24 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - House - OTP (Y: 168 N: 176 NV: 27 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - House - OTP (Y: 168 N: 176 NV: 27 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Lay HB123 on Table (): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 18 |
2023-02-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 168-176 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 16 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/09/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 23 |
2023-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government |