NH HB1229 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-27 - Executive Session: 09/25/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-27 - Executive Session: 09/25/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the purchase and sale of any interest in real property abutting public waters.
Title
Relative to the purchase and sale of any interest in real property abutting public waters.
Sponsors
Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Rep. Matthew Coker [R] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Rep. John MacDonald [R] |
Rep. Karel Crawford [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-27 | House | Executive Session: 09/25/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-08-27 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/25/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-02-22 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 18 |
2024-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/07/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |