NH HB1229 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/13/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/13/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study school meal programs in New Hampshire's public schools and non-sectarian schools that accept public funds.
Title
Establishing a committee to study school meal programs in New Hampshire's public schools and non-sectarian schools that accept public funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | House | Interim Study Work Session: 06/13/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-05-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 06/07/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-02-16 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |