NH HB1226 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to restricting the watering of lawns through the use of private wells.
Title
Relative to restricting the watering of lawns through the use of private wells.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris True [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 52 |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 30 |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-02-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 3 |