NH HB1226 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - House Signed by the Governor 05/19/2010; Effective 07/18/2010; Chapter 0081
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - House Signed by the Governor 05/19/2010; Effective 07/18/2010; Chapter 0081
Summary
Relative to caregiver support services for the elderly.
Title
Relative to caregiver support services for the elderly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | House Signed by the Governor 05/19/2010; Effective 07/18/2010; Chapter 0081 | |
2010-04-21 | House Enrolled; House Journal 35, PG.1671 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 14, Pg.295 | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 14, Pg.290 | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 4/14/10; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Hearing: April 6, 2010, Room 103, State House, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11, Pg.261 | |
2010-03-24 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0771h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 201-153; House Journal 30, PG.1493-1494 | |
2010-03-24 | House Amendment #0771h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1493-1494 | |
2010-02-23 | House Minority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study; House Calendar 22, PG.1222-1223 | |
2010-02-23 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #0771h; House Calendar 22, PG.1238 | |
2010-02-23 | House Majority Comm Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0771h for Mar 24 (Vote 13-9; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.1222-1223 | |
2010-02-09 | House Executive Session: 2/18/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-02-09 | House Full Committee Work Session: 2/16/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-01-27 | House Referred to Finance; House Journal 12, PG.502 | |
2010-01-27 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 12, PG.502 | |
2010-01-20 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 27 Consent Calendar (vote 16-1); House Calendar 8, PG.333 | |
2010-01-06 | House Executive Session: 1/20/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/14/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-01-06 | House Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 6, PG.232 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2344&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |