NH HB1223 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to meeting attendance requirements for elected members of budget committee and school board.
Title
Relative to meeting attendance requirements for elected members of budget committee and school board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-02-07 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2022 1:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2022 12:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |