NH HB1223 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 244-56 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study legislator compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study legislator compensation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 244-56 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 38
2018-02-09HouseSpecial Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 3 P. 81
2018-01-26HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 8-3; Regular Calendar)
2018-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 01/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 104
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2018 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 104
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback