NH HB1222 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to inquiries concerning salary history by prospective employers.
Title
Relative to inquiries concerning salary history by prospective employers.
Sponsors
Rep. Janice Schmidt [D] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Ivy Vann [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 21 |
2018-03-07 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-07 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-02-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 60 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 307 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 1 P. 3 |