NH HB122 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB122
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 47; Eff. 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 47; Eff. 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amending the capital appropriation for an aviation hangar bay in the department of military affairs and veterans services.
Title
Amending the capital appropriation for an aviation hangar bay in the department of military affairs and veterans services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 47; Eff. 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/14/2022; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/07/2022, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Capital Budget; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-2128h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-09 | House | Amendment # 2021-2128h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-12-08 | House | Executive Session: 10/06/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2128h (NT) 10/06/2021 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 37 |
2021-09-15 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2021-2111h: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92864158967 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 2 P. 36 |
Same As/Similar To
HB122 (Carry Over) 2021-09-15 - Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2021-2111h: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203