NH HB122 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2202s (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing for gifts, grants, and donations to legislative employees or officers for expenses associated with state and national legislative association events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing for gifts, grants, and donations to legislative employees or officers for expenses associated with state and national legislative association events.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2202s (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2202s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2202s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2202s, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24
2019-05-02Senate==RESCHEDULED== Hearing: 05/16/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 21
2019-04-25Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 05/15/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0120h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 17
2019-02-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0120h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 17
2019-02-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0120h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 8
2019-01-24HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 2 P. 38

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback