NH HB122 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Veto Override 06/24/2015; Effective 08/23/2015; Chapter 0157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Veto Override 06/24/2015; Effective 08/23/2015; Chapter 0157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to advertising of liquor or beverages.
Title
Relative to advertising of liquor or beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Notwithstanding the Governor's veto shall the bill become law? (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - Veto Override (Y: 236 N: 95 NV: 19 Abs: 49) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - Veto Override (Y: 236 N: 95 NV: 19 Abs: 49) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | Veto Override 06/24/2015; Effective 08/23/2015; Chapter 0157 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall HB 122 Become Law: Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Veto Overridden by required two-thirds vote |
2015-06-11 | House | Veto Overriden: Regular Calendar 236-95 By Required Two-Thirds Vote; House Journal 46, PG. 1981-1983 |
2015-06-03 | House | Vetoed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; House Journal 46, PG. 1981 |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1781 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-06 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1221s (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1747 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1221s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1221s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1221s, 4/9/15; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 3/31/15, Room 100, State House, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 767 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 390 |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Seesion: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/17/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2015 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 1/15/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 7, PG. 118 |