NH HB1216 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to liability for deferred property taxes and relative to applications for abatement of property taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to liability for deferred property taxes and relative to applications for abatement of property taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18
2018-03-20SenateHearing: 04/04/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0008h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 49
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0008h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 49
2018-02-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0008h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 28
2018-01-11HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 02/14/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback