NH HB1211 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to presite built housing.
Title
Relative to presite built housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 49 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 27 |
2018-01-11 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 3 |