NH HB1206 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to bonds for civil officers.
Title
Relative to bonds for civil officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 33 |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 18 |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 3 |