NH HB119 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to legislative approval of the New Hampshire general court for increases in the systems benefit charge.
Title
Relative to legislative approval of the New Hampshire general court for increases in the systems benefit charge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-02-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 82 |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2021 03:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92752912485 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 35 |