NH HB119 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-05 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1621s (Rep Cote): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 238-104; House Journal 49, PG.1586-1588
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-05 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1621s (Rep Cote): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 238-104; House Journal 49, PG.1586-1588
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to voter registration.
Title
Relative to voter registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - NON-CONCUR (REP COTE) (Y: 238 N: 104 NV: 21 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Sen. Pierce Floor Amendment 1902s (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1621s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - OTP/AM 0494H (Y: 190 N: 149 NV: 14 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Sen. Pierce Floor Amendment 1902s (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1621s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - OTP/AM 0494H (Y: 190 N: 149 NV: 14 Abs: 44) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1621s (Rep Cote): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 238-104; House Journal 49, PG.1586-1588 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1621s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Pierce Floor Amendment #2013-1902s, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Amendment Failed; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1621s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1621s, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/3/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8 |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0494h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 190-149; House Journal 26, PG.814-817 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0494h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.814-815 |
2013-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.523-524 |
2013-03-07 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-0494h; House Calendar 22, PG.536-537 |
2013-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0494h for Mar 13 (Vote 10-8; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.523-524 |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 1/22/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG.183 |