NH HB1187 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to milk pasteurization.
Title
Relative to milk pasteurization.
Sponsors
Rep. James Allard [R] | Rep. Stephen Woodcock [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Brodie Deshaies [R] |
Rep. Gary Merchant [D] | Rep. Judy Aron [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved to Remove HB 1187 from the Consent Calendar; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-23 | House | Amendment # 2022-0340h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0340h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0340h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2022 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Environment and Agriculture |