NH HB1184 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Div 205-90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Div 205-90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the speed limit on a portion of Route 101 to 70 miles per hour.
Title
Increasing the speed limit on a portion of Route 101 to 70 miles per hour.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Div 205-90 |
2014-02-19 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Vaillancourt) |
2014-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/4/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Transportation |