NH HB1183 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of property taxes for residents 75 years of age and older.
Title
Relative to the calculation of property taxes for residents 75 years of age and older.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2022 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |