NH HB1181 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing the New Hampshire public employer labor relations board to award pain and suffering damages.
Title
Allowing the New Hampshire public employer labor relations board to award pain and suffering damages.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Gilman [D] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Mark King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 10 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0185h |
2020-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 32 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 1 P. 12 |