NH HB1177 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Lay HB1177 on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 167-157 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Lay HB1177 on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 167-157 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to permissible residential units in a residential zone.
Title
Relative to permissible residential units in a residential zone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - Remove from Table (Y: 159 N: 176 NV: 23 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - House - Table (Y: 167 N: 157 NV: 36 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Table (Y: 167 N: 157 NV: 36 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Lay HB1177 on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 167-157 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-02-07 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |