NH HB1177 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to qualifications of referees in the superior courts and circuit courts.
Title
Relative to qualifications of referees in the superior courts and circuit courts.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Camarota [R] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Sen. Harold French [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 130 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 60 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 12 |