NH HB1171 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the application of federal Occupational Safety and Health Act standards to public employers.
Title
Relative to the application of federal Occupational Safety and Health Act standards to public employers.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Sullivan [D] | Rep. Dianne Schuett [D] | Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
Rep. Patrick Long [D] | Rep. Troy Merner [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - OTPA (Y: 179 N: 106 NV: 66 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0827h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 179-106 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 159 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-0827h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 159 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0827h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 65 |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/25/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 104 |
2020-02-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/12/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2020-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 1 P. 12 |