NH HB117 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-16 - Full Committee Work Session: 01/22/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Jan 22 @ 2:00 pm in Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing exemptions under the interest and dividends tax and decreasing the total amount of research and development credits against business taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing exemptions under the interest and dividends tax and decreasing the total amount of research and development credits against business taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-16HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/22/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Ways and Means

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback