NH HB1165 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the Granite State paid family leave plan.
Title
Repealing the Granite State paid family leave plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Prout [R] | Rep. Norman Silber [R] | Rep. Leonard Turcotte [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] |
Rep. Lex Berezhny [R] | Rep. Dawn Johnson [R] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] | Rep. Erica Layon [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - OTP (Y: 172 N: 164 NV: 24 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Table (Y: 160 N: 172 NV: 28 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - House - Table (Y: 160 N: 172 NV: 28 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-17 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 172-164 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-17 | House | Lay HB1165 on Table (Rep. Sullivan): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 160-172 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2022-03-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/09/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/09/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2022 10:45 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |